Medical School:
University of the West Indies Faculty of Medical Sciences, Jamaica, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine |
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
AVP - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto