THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:08:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
13 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2024 to 12 Feb 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
13 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2023 to 12 Feb 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 13 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 12 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 13 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 12 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022