THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:13:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 83 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Kitchener ON N2G 1A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Delhi St
Homewood Health Center
Psychiatry
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 83 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Kitchener ON N2G 1A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Delhi St
Homewood Health Center
Psychiatry
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 May 2025
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 02 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. MAHDI HASSAN shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HASSAN is enrolled at McMaster University.

(2) In Dr. HASSAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. HASSAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HASSAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. HASSAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. HASSAN shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. HASSAN may practise psychiatry and to the extent of their employment at:

(a) Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College;

(b) Niagara Health System St. Catharines, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(c) St. Joseph's Healthcare System Hamilton, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. HASSAN’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. HASSAN may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. HASSAN must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. HASSAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. HASSAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. HASSAN must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. HASSAN’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. HASSAN’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. HASSAN to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. HASSAN’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. HASSAN takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. HASSAN may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. HASSAN applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. MAHDI HASSAN shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HASSAN is enrolled at McMaster University.

(2) In Dr. HASSAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. HASSAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HASSAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. HASSAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. HASSAN shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. HASSAN may practise psychiatry and to the extent of their employment at:

(a) Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College;

(b) Niagara Health System St. Catharines, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(c) St. Joseph's Healthcare System Hamilton, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. HASSAN’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. HASSAN may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. HASSAN must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. HASSAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. HASSAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. HASSAN must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. HASSAN’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. HASSAN’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. HASSAN to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. HASSAN’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. HASSAN takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. HASSAN may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. HASSAN applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
16 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Jul 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 15 Jul 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 16 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 15 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 15 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 May 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 May 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022