Medical School:
Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
01 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
29 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 28 Jul 2024 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
29 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 28 Jul 2023 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
01 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
29 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 28 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
29 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 28 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University