THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:32:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 221 Brant Ave
Avenue Medical Clinic
Brantford ON N3T 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 221 Brant Ave
Avenue Medical Clinic
Brantford ON N3T 3J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILICA NOVAKOVIC shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NOVAKOVIC is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. NOVAKOVIC shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NOVAKOVIC is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NOVAKOVIC shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NOVAKOVIC is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NOVAKOVIC no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILICA NOVAKOVIC shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NOVAKOVIC is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. NOVAKOVIC shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NOVAKOVIC is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. NOVAKOVIC shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NOVAKOVIC is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NOVAKOVIC no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
16 Dec 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Dec 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
DATE: 16 Dec 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 15 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022