THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:26:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 881 King Street West
King West Medical Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-8030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 33a Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1J7
Phone: 519-938-9997
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jan 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 17 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 881 King Street West
King West Medical Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-8030
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 33a Broadway
Orangeville Ontario L9W 1J7
Phone: 519-938-9997
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jan 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 17 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Jan 2025
16 Jan 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 17 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jan 16 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. KAN LUN ZHU may practise family medicine with King West Medical Clinic in Hamilton, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ZHU’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ZHU’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ZHU’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 January, 2025, and will expire on or before 16 January, 2028, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. KAN LUN ZHU may practise family medicine with King West Medical Clinic in Hamilton, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ZHU’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ZHU’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ZHU’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 January, 2025, and will expire on or before 16 January, 2028, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Nov 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 16 Jan 2028

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2022