THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:51:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Room B3-143B
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Room B3-143B
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN PATRICK HAAS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HAAS is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. HAAS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HAAS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HAAS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HAAS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HAAS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN PATRICK HAAS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HAAS is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. HAAS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HAAS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HAAS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HAAS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HAAS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022