THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:08:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Hôpital Montfort
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4512 Ste-Catherine Street
Unit B
Saint Isidore Ontario K0C 2B0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Hôpital Montfort
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4512 Ste-Catherine Street
Unit B
Saint Isidore Ontario K0C 2B0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIKAËLLE DIANE LABONTÉ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABONTÉ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIKAËLLE DIANE LABONTÉ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABONTÉ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022