THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:27:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 May 2024
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 23 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. RAPHAEL DENIS LESSARD shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LESSARD is enrolled at the University of Ottawa.

(2) In Dr. LESSARD’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. LESSARD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LESSARD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. LESSARD’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. LESSARD shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. LESSARD may practise adult critical care medicine and to the extent of his employment at the Ottawa Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. LESSARD’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. LESSARD may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. LESSARD must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. LESSARD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. LESSARD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. LESSARD must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. LESSARD’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. LESSARD’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. LESSARD to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. LESSARD’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. LESSARD takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. LESSARD may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. LESSARD applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. RAPHAEL DENIS LESSARD shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LESSARD is enrolled at the University of Ottawa.

(2) In Dr. LESSARD’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. LESSARD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LESSARD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. LESSARD’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. LESSARD shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. LESSARD may practise adult critical care medicine and to the extent of his employment at the Ottawa Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. LESSARD’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. LESSARD may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. LESSARD must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. LESSARD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. LESSARD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. LESSARD must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. LESSARD’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. LESSARD’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. LESSARD to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. LESSARD’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. LESSARD takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. LESSARD may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. LESSARD applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022