THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: Cadieux, Agnes (Used Until: 27 Apr 2022)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 499 Raglan Street North
hospital
emergency medicine
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-432-4851
Extension: 254
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Blanche River Health Englehart
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Bingham Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Matheson

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

General Information

Former Name: Cadieux, Agnes (Used Until: 27 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 499 Raglan Street North
hospital
emergency medicine
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-432-4851
Extension: 254
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Blanche River Health Englehart
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Blanche River Health
LOCATION: Englehart

HOSPITAL: Lady Minto Hospital
LOCATION: Cochrane

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Bingham Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Matheson

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AGNES SOBIESIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBIESIAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AGNES SOBIESIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBIESIAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022