Medical School:
University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery |
30 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 29 Oct 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE:
30 Oct 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 29 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa