THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:34:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: Snyder, Jessica Rose (Used Until: 26 Apr 2022)
Medical School: Western University, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Division of Paediatrics
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Snyder, Jessica Rose (Used Until: 26 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Victoria Hospital
Division of Paediatrics
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA ROSE GARABON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GARABON is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. GARABON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GARABON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GARABON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GARABON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GARABON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JESSICA ROSE GARABON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GARABON is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. GARABON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GARABON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GARABON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GARABON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GARABON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022