THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:47:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: FADINA, Adetowobola (Used Until: 26 Apr 2022)
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Main St W
David Braley Health Sciences
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Main St W
McMaster University, Department of Family Medicine
2nd floor
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: FADINA, Adetowobola (Used Until: 26 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Main St W
David Braley Health Sciences
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Main St W
McMaster University, Department of Family Medicine
2nd floor
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADETOWOBOLA ADEYIMIKA OLOTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLOTU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADETOWOBOLA ADEYIMIKA OLOTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLOTU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022