THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:25:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: Legault, Josée Aurore Marie (Used Until: 05 Oct 2023)
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Legault, Josée Aurore Marie (Used Until: 05 Oct 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSÉE AURORE RAVENEK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RAVENEK is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. RAVENEK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAVENEK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RAVENEK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RAVENEK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RAVENEK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 5 October, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSÉE AURORE RAVENEK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RAVENEK is enrolled at Northern Ontario School of Medicine;
(2) Dr. RAVENEK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAVENEK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RAVENEK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RAVENEK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RAVENEK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 5 October, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 05 Oct 2025
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
17 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 16 Jul 2023
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 05 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 17 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 16 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Northern Ontario School of Medicine

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 05 Oct 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 05 Oct 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022