Medical School:
Queen's University, 2022
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrical Surgical Skills) |
12 Jan 2026 to 05 Apr 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrical Surgical Skills) |
01 Jul 2025 to 11 Jan 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrical Surgical Skills) |
09 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 08 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrical Surgical Skills)
DATE:
12 Jan 2026 to 05 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrical Surgical Skills)
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 11 Jan 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrical Surgical Skills)
DATE:
09 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 08 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto