THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:32:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: Yeuchyk, Tatsiana (Used Until: 29 Mar 2023)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Harbour Street
HealthOne Toronto
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M5J 2L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166130333
Fax: 6476896503

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Yeuchyk, Tatsiana (Used Until: 29 Mar 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Harbour Street
HealthOne Toronto
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M5J 2L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166130333
Fax: 6476896503

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TATSIANA DEMARCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMARCO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TATSIANA DEMARCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMARCO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022