THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:38:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: Yurakh, Nataliya (Used Until: 26 Apr 2022)
Medical School: Ivano-Frankivsk National Medical University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 523 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M8Y 1J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167608367
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Poland
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

General Information

Former Name: Yurakh, Nataliya (Used Until: 26 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ivano-Frankivsk National Medical University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 523 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M8Y 1J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167608367
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Poland
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIYA SZOZDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZOZDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIYA SZOZDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZOZDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ivano-Frankivsk National Medical University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022