Medical School:
Universidade Federal do Estado do Rio de Janeiro (UNIRIO) Escola de Medicina e Cirurgia, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Palliative Care) |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Queen's University |
PEAP - R - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022 |
Queen's University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Palliative Care)
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
23 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - R - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 22 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University