Medical School:
Universidad Católica de Córdoba Facultad de Medicina, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Hematology |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Oct 2025 |
McMaster University |
Clinical Fellow - Hematology |
01 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
Clinical Fellow - Hematology |
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Oct 2024 |
McMaster University |
Clinical Fellow - Hematology |
01 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
McMaster University |
Clinical Fellow - Hematology |
24 Jul 2023 to 31 Oct 2023 |
McMaster University |
PEAP - CF - Hematology |
01 May 2023 to 23 Jul 2023 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE:
01 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE:
01 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE:
24 Jul 2023 to 31 Oct 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Hematology
DATE:
01 May 2023 to 23 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University