THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:47:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies Faculty of Medicine St. Augustine, Trinidad, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-500 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies Faculty of Medicine St. Augustine, Trinidad, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-500 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARUN MANSUR ABDULLAH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ABDULLAH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ABDULLAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ABDULLAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ABDULLAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ABDULLAH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ABDULLAH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 March, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARUN MANSUR ABDULLAH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ABDULLAH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ABDULLAH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ABDULLAH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ABDULLAH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ABDULLAH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ABDULLAH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 March, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies Faculty of Medicine St. Augustine, Trinidad, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Mar 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
24 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 Oct 2022 to 23 Dec 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Mar 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 24 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Oct 2022 to 23 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Mar 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Mar 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2022