THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:01:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham College of Medical and Dental Sciences, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 King St W
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
Medical Oncology
Burr Building
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 549 6666
Extension: 4502
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 22 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham College of Medical and Dental Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 King St W
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
Medical Oncology
Burr Building
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 549 6666
Extension: 4502
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 22 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Nov 2022
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 22 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIAM JAFRI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology, Queen's University, in which Dr. JAFRI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. JAFRI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. JAFRI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. JAFRI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 22 November, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. JAFRI's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIAM JAFRI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Oncology, Queen's University, in which Dr. JAFRI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. JAFRI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. JAFRI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. JAFRI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 22 November, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2026. Upon renewal of Dr. JAFRI's academic appointment at Queen's University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham College of Medical and Dental Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026