THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:29:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Internal Medicine
03 Oct 2022 to 21 Oct 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
12 Sep 2022 to 30 Sep 2022
McMaster University
EL - General Internal Medicine
29 Aug 2022 to 09 Sep 2022
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 17 Jan 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Internal Medicine
DATE: 03 Oct 2022 to 21 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 12 Sep 2022 to 30 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 29 Aug 2022 to 09 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 17 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022