THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:16:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow University of Health Sciences, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
01 Feb 2025 to 14 Feb 2025
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
26 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
01 Feb 2023 to 25 Apr 2023
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
DATE: 01 Feb 2025 to 14 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
DATE: 26 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
DATE: 01 Feb 2023 to 25 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Feb 2025
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2023