THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:44:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 672 Dupont Street
Unit 106
Toronto Ontario M6G 1Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 536-8000
Fax: (647) 689-6221
Address: 672 Dupont Street
The Clinic at Christie
Unit 106
Toronto Ontario M6G 1Z6
Phone: (416) 536-8000
Fax: (647) 689-6221
Address: The Clinic at Christie
Unit 106
Phone: (416) 536-8000
Fax: (647) 689-6221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 672 Dupont Street
Unit 106
Toronto Ontario M6G 1Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 536-8000
Fax: (647) 689-6221
Address: 672 Dupont Street
The Clinic at Christie
Unit 106
Toronto Ontario M6G 1Z6
Phone: (416) 536-8000
Fax: (647) 689-6221
Address: The Clinic at Christie
Unit 106
Phone: (416) 536-8000
Fax: (647) 689-6221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADISON TAYLOR WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADISON TAYLOR WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022