Medical School:
Western University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
EL - Medical Oncology |
31 Jul 2023 to 27 Aug 2023 |
University of Toronto |
EL - Medical Oncology |
05 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
EL - Medical Oncology
DATE:
31 Jul 2023 to 27 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
EL - Medical Oncology
DATE:
05 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University