THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:34:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE ADAM KRAMER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KRAMER is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. KRAMER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KRAMER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KRAMER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KRAMER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KRAMER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 17 November, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE ADAM KRAMER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KRAMER is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. KRAMER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KRAMER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KRAMER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KRAMER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KRAMER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 17 November, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 17 Nov 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
22 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 21 Oct 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
07 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 06 May 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 17 Nov 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 22 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 21 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 07 May 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 06 May 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 17 Nov 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 17 Nov 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2022