THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:10:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2132 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-543-9797
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 631 Queenston Road
103
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
Phone: (905) 578-9255
Fax: 905-578-9082
Address: 2579 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 4B8
Phone: 289-667-3709
Fax: 289-667-1336
Address: 168 Barton Street
Hamilton Ontario L8E 4V6
Phone: (905) 664-6762
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2132 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2132 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-543-9797
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 631 Queenston Road
103
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
Phone: (905) 578-9255
Fax: 905-578-9082
Address: 2579 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 4B8
Phone: 289-667-3709
Fax: 289-667-1336
Address: 168 Barton Street
Hamilton Ontario L8E 4V6
Phone: (905) 664-6762
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2132 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBAB FATIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATIMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBAB FATIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATIMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 10 Oct 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2022