THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:27:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 14 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 14 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 14 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 14 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Mar 2025
30 Jun 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 14 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MEENAKSHI GOEL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Generalists, McMaster University, in which Dr. GOEL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GOEL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GOEL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GOEL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 14 March, 2025, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. GOEL's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MEENAKSHI GOEL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Generalists, McMaster University, in which Dr. GOEL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GOEL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. GOEL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. GOEL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 14 March, 2025, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. GOEL's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2025
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2028

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2022