THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:07:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kupakuwana, Gillian Vimbai (Used Until: 18 May 2022)
Medical School: Columbia University Vagelos College of Physicians and Surgeons, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Department of Medicine
Division of Hematology
Room 2025
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus 1967 Riverside Drive
Suites M1840-M1859
Box 206
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Kupakuwana, Gillian Vimbai (Used Until: 18 May 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Columbia University Vagelos College of Physicians and Surgeons, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Department of Medicine
Division of Hematology
Room 2025
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus 1967 Riverside Drive
Suites M1840-M1859
Box 206
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN VIMBAI KUPAKUWANA-SUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUPAKUWANA-SUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN VIMBAI KUPAKUWANA-SUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUPAKUWANA-SUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Columbia University Vagelos College of Physicians and Surgeons, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022