THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:47:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Chengalpattu Medical College, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Endocrinology
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-5838
Fax: (705) 876-5156
Address: 7475 McCowan Road
Markham Ontario L3S 3J6
Phone: 9052099221
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Chengalpattu Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Endocrinology
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-5838
Fax: (705) 876-5156
Address: 7475 McCowan Road
Markham Ontario L3S 3J6
Phone: 9052099221
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBAGINI PARAMESWARANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAMESWARANATHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUBAGINI PARAMESWARANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAMESWARANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chengalpattu Medical College, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2022