THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:06:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
HULC
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
HULC
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUN ZHOU MARY SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUN ZHOU MARY SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2022