THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:24:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
01 Sep 2025 to 14 Sep 2025
University of Toronto
EL - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jul 2023
University of Toronto
EL - Gastroenterology
21 Nov 2022 to 18 Dec 2022
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Sep 2025 to 14 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 21 Nov 2022 to 18 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Dec 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2022