THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:58:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: Tsai, Chiao-Jung (Used Until: 26 May 2022)
Medical School: Vanderbilt University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Dept of Radiation Oncology
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1101 Hempstead Tpke
Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center
Radiation Oncology
Uniondale NY United States 11553-1112
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 26 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Tsai, Chiao-Jung (Used Until: 26 May 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN, TAIWANESE
Medical School: Vanderbilt University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Dept of Radiation Oncology
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1101 Hempstead Tpke
Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center
Radiation Oncology
Uniondale NY United States 11553-1112
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 26 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Nov 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 08 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CHIAOJUNG JILLIAN TSAI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Radiation Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. TSAI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. TSAI no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. CHIAOJUNG JILLIAN TSAI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Radiation Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. TSAI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. TSAI no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Vanderbilt University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Nov 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 25 Oct 2029