THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:13:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Suite 091
Division of Neurosurgery
St. Michael’s Hospital
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 14 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Suite 091
Division of Neurosurgery
St. Michael’s Hospital
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 14 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR MUSAAD Z ALSHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSHARIF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR MUSAAD Z ALSHARIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSHARIF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 May 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 28 May 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2022