Medical School:
Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology |
15 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology |
01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jul 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
EL - Gastroenterology |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jul 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
EL - Gastroenterology |
24 Oct 2022 to 20 Nov 2022 |
Western University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
DATE:
15 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 14 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
EL - Gastroenterology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
EL - Gastroenterology
DATE:
24 Oct 2022 to 20 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY:
Western University