THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:50:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Boulevard Décarie
CUSM hospital
Montréal Québec H4A 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514 9341934
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Boulevard Décarie
CUSM hospital
Montréal Québec H4A 3J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 514 9341934
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDITH MARTEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDITH MARTEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2022