THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:00:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMENEH HOSSEIN AMINI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AMINI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AMINI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AMINI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AMINI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AMINI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AMINI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 May, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMENEH HOSSEIN AMINI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AMINI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AMINI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AMINI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AMINI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AMINI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AMINI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 May, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
21 Mar 2025 to 30 May 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 20 Mar 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
21 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 20 Mar 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
30 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
18 Nov 2022 to 29 Jan 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
DATE: 21 Mar 2025 to 30 May 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 20 Mar 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
DATE: 21 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 20 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
DATE: 30 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
DATE: 18 Nov 2022 to 29 Jan 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 May 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 May 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2022