THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:00:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4448 Front St SE
Calgary AB T3M 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4448 Front St SE
Calgary AB T3M 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUDREY MARY MAHER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MAHER is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. MAHER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MAHER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MAHER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MAHER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MAHER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AUDREY MARY MAHER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MAHER is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. MAHER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MAHER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MAHER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MAHER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MAHER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Family Practice Anesthesia)
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
EL - Anesthesiology
11 Apr 2023 to 08 May 2023
University of Ottawa
EL - Anesthesiology
27 Sep 2022 to 24 Oct 2022
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Family Practice Anesthesia)
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Anesthesiology
DATE: 11 Apr 2023 to 08 May 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Anesthesiology
DATE: 27 Sep 2022 to 24 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2022