THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:15:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1953
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Nov 1958
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1958
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Y. Hiraki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Aug 2020

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 11 Nov 1958
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1958
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George Y. Hiraki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Aug 2020

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2010

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 16 Apr 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George Yoshinori Hiraki to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 16, 2019:

Following a public complaint that raised concerns about my standard of practice in general surgery, Dr. Hiraki underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in general surgery. In the face of this reassessment report, Dr. Hiraki resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 16 Apr 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. George Yoshinori Hiraki to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 16, 2019:

Following a public complaint that raised concerns about my standard of practice in general surgery, Dr. Hiraki underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in general surgery. In the face of this reassessment report, Dr. Hiraki resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1953

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1953
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1953