Medical School:
McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine |
07 Apr 2026 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 06 Apr 2026 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine |
08 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 07 Apr 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine |
09 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 08 Apr 2024 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine |
11 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine |
29 Aug 2022 to 10 Apr 2023 |
Western University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine
DATE:
07 Apr 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 06 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine
DATE:
08 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 07 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine
DATE:
09 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 08 Apr 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine
DATE:
11 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine
DATE:
29 Aug 2022 to 10 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Western University