THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:33:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POOJA PATEL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PATEL is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. PATEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PATEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PATEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PATEL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PATEL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POOJA PATEL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PATEL is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. PATEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PATEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PATEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PATEL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PATEL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
EL - Thoracic Surgery
23 Nov 2022 to 20 Dec 2022
University of Toronto
EL - Thoracic Surgery
26 Oct 2022 to 22 Nov 2022
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 23 Nov 2022 to 20 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Thoracic Surgery
DATE: 26 Oct 2022 to 22 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2022