THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:57:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Anesthesiology
24 Oct 2022 to 20 Nov 2022
Western University
EL - Anesthesiology
26 Sep 2022 to 23 Oct 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Anesthesiology
DATE: 24 Oct 2022 to 20 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: EL - Anesthesiology
DATE: 26 Sep 2022 to 23 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2022