THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:29:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Medical Laboratory Technology Canada
PROFESSION: Medical Laboratory Technology
JURISDICTION: Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Medical Laboratory Technology Canada
PROFESSION: Medical Laboratory Technology
JURISDICTION: Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ADAM COOPER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. COOPER is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. COOPER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. COOPER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. COOPER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. COOPER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. COOPER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ADAM COOPER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. COOPER is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. COOPER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. COOPER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. COOPER shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. COOPER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. COOPER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
EL - Nephrology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
McMaster University
EL - Nephrology
05 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
EL - General Internal Medicine
16 Jan 2023 to 12 Feb 2023
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Nephrology
DATE: 05 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 16 Jan 2023 to 12 Feb 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2023