THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:22:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2022