Medical School:
University of the West Indies at Cave Hill Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 05 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
28 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 27 Aug 2023 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine |
05 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 05 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
28 Aug 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 27 Aug 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
05 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto