Medical School:
Trinity College Dublin School of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Neurology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
EL - Neurology |
23 Oct 2023 to 17 Nov 2023 |
University of Toronto |
EL - Neurology |
13 Mar 2023 to 07 Apr 2023 |
University of Ottawa |
EL - Neurology |
26 Sep 2022 to 21 Oct 2022 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
EL - Neurology
DATE:
23 Oct 2023 to 17 Nov 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
EL - Neurology
DATE:
13 Mar 2023 to 07 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
EL - Neurology
DATE:
26 Sep 2022 to 21 Oct 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto