Medical School:
M.S. Ramaiah Medical College, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology |
23 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
16 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
13 Mar 2024 to 15 Mar 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
01 Jul 2023 to 12 Mar 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine |
04 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine |
16 Mar 2023 to 03 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE:
23 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
16 Mar 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
13 Mar 2024 to 15 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 12 Mar 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
04 Jun 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE:
16 Mar 2023 to 03 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto