Medical School:
Jordan University of Science and Technology Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
20 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2024 to 19 Sep 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
20 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Aug 2023 to 19 Sep 2023 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
31 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology |
08 Nov 2022 to 30 Jan 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
20 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 19 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
20 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Aug 2023 to 19 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Jul 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
31 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE:
08 Nov 2022 to 30 Jan 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto