THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:29:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: Medeiros Pontes, Denise (Used Until: 19 Dec 2022)
Medical School: Universidade Federal do Ceará Faculdade de Medicina Fortaleza, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Medeiros Pontes, Denise (Used Until: 19 Dec 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade Federal do Ceará Faculdade de Medicina Fortaleza, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal do Ceará Faculdade de Medicina Fortaleza, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
06 Dec 2024 to 21 Mar 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 05 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
26 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2023 to 25 Mar 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 06 Dec 2024 to 21 Mar 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 05 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 26 Mar 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2023 to 25 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Mar 2025
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2023
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2023