THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:30:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Creditview Road
Creditview Medical Centre
Mississauga Ontario L5C 3Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 275-7999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Creditview Road
Creditview Medical Centre
Mississauga Ontario L5C 3Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 275-7999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID EL SABAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL SABAWY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID EL SABAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL SABAWY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Jan 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2022